MS SC581 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-09 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting Hinds Community College President Dr. Clyde Muse For Inventing The Game Of T-ball.
Title
Recognize Dr. Clyde Muse for inventing the game of T-Ball.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-27 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-02-27 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-02-27 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-02-27 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |