MS SC578 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Northwest Mississippi Community College Cheer Team And Coach Brandon Casey For Winning Consecutive National Championship Titles In The Uca/uda National Cheer Competition.
Title
Commend Northwest Community College Cheer Team for National Titles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-24 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Rules |