MS SC578 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Saluting The Legislative Members Of Kappa Alpha Psi Fraternity, Inc., And Designating February 16, 2016, As "kappa Day At The State Capitol."
Title
Recognize Legislative members of Kappa Alpha Psi and designate February 16, 2016, as "Kappa Day at the State Capitol."
Sponsors
Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-02-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-02-24 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-02-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |