MS SC572 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Biggersville High School "lions" Girls And Boys Basketball Teams And Head Coach Cliff Little For Winning Two Mhsaa Class 1a State Championships On The Same Day.
Title
Commend Biggersville Girls and Boys Basketball Teams and Coach Cliff Little for two State Championships on same day.
Sponsors
Sen. Rita Potts Parks [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] |
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-24 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |