MS SC572 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Designate February 6, 2019, As American Heart Association "national Wear Red Day" In Mississippi To Bring Awareness To The Effects Of Cardiovascular Disease In Women.
Title
Designate February 6, 2019, as American Heart Association "National Wear Red Day."
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Doty [R] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Chris Massey [R] | Sen. David Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |