MS SC570 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Jackson Prep "lady Patriots" Girls Basketball Team And Head Coach Michael Mcanally For Winning The 2022 Mais Overall State Championship.
Title
Commend Jackson Prep "Lady Patriots" Girls Basketball Team for winning MAIS Overall State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] | Sen. Josh Harkins [R] | Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] |
Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-24 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-24 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-24 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |