MS SC569 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on October 2 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Suspending The Deadlines For The Purpose Of Requesting The Drafting, Introduction, Consideration And Passage Of A Bill Entitled "an Act To Establish A Program To Allow The Medical Use Of Marijuana Products By Qualified Persons With Debilitating Medical Conditions As Authorized Under New Article 16, Section 290 Of The Mississippi Constitution Of 1890, Offered By The Mississippi Legislature As An Alternative To Initiative Measure No. 65; And For Related Purposes."
Title
Suspend rules; establish program for medical marijuana as authorized by Legislative alternative to Initiative No. 65.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Kirby [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Recommitted to Committee |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/SC/SC0569.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SC/SC0569IN.htm |