MS SC568 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-13 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Success Of The Innovative Cultural Exchange Program Established By Columbia High School With Counterpart Students And Teachers From Etampes, France.
Title
Recognize cultural exchange program between Columbia High School and students and teachers from Etampes, France.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2013-03-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-03-07 | House | Immediate Release |
2013-03-07 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-03-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |