MS SC566 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Simpson County Academy Cross Country "lady Cougars" For Winning The 2017 Mais Division Ii State Championship.
Title
Commend Simpson County Academy Cross Country "Lady Cougars" for winning State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House Adopted (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-26 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-06 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-02-06 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-02-06 | House | Adopted |
2018-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred To Rules |