MS SC565 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-25 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Congratulating The Millsaps "majors" Football Team And Coach Aaron Pelch For Their Outstanding 2013 Season And Their Second Consecutive Southern Athletic Association (saa) Title.
Title
Recognize Millsaps "Majors" Football Team for second consecutive SAA Title.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-20 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-20 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-02-20 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-02-20 | House | Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-02-14 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred To Rules |