MS SC560 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Suspending The Deadlines For The Purpose Of Requesting The Drafting, Introduction, Consideration And Passage Of A Bill Entitled "an Act To Require The Public Service Commission To Modify The Boundaries Of The Electric Service Area Operated By The City Of Holly Springs Such That Its Service Area Is Limited To The City Limits Of Holly Springs; To Authorize Certain Electric Cooperatives To Provide Electric Service To Those Customers Who Would Have Been Served By The City Of Holly Springs Under The District's Previous Boundaries; And For Related Purposes."
Title
Suspend rules; introduction of bill to require Public Service Commission to change boundaries of certain utility district.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 40 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred To Rules |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred To Rules |