MS SC560 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on June 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commemorating The 75th Anniversary Of The Deactivation Of General Patton's 3rd Army, 65th Infantry Division, And Honoring Their Service To Our Nation.
Title
Commemorate the 75th Anniversary of deactivation and service of General Patton's 3rd Army, 65th Infantry Division.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Seymour [R] | Sen. David Blount [D] | Sen. Jeremy England [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Philip Moran [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-05-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-05-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-05-28 | House | Adopted |
2020-05-27 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |