MS SC560 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-03 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Commend Senator Johnnie E. Walls, Jr., Upon His Investiture As Circuit Court Judge For The Second District Of Bolivar County And For His Distinguished Service In The Mississippi Senate.
Title
Commend public service of Senator Johnnie E. Walls, Jr.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-01 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-27 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-03 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2011-02-01 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2011-02-01 | Immediate Release | |
2011-02-01 | Adopted | |
2011-01-31 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-27 | Referred To Rules | |
2011-01-27 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-01-27 | Immediate Release | |
2011-01-27 | Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2011-01-17 | Referred To Rules |