MS SC557 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-27 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Laura Bivins Of Ann Smith Elementary School In Madison County For Receiving Mississippi's 2020 Presidential Award For Excellence In Mathematics And Science Teaching, Which Is The Highest Such Award From The United States Government.
Title
Commend Laura Bivins for receiving Mississippi's Presidential Award for Excellence in Math and Science Teaching.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-27 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-27 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-26 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-24 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |