MS SC557 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Dr. London Branch, Founder Of The Jackson State University Symphony Orchestra, For His Outstanding Contributions To The Field Of Music As A Recipient Of The 2019 Governor's Arts Award For Excellence In Music And Education.
Title
Commend JSU Music Professor Dr. London Branch for outstanding contributions to the field of music and Governor's Arts Award.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Tammy Witherspoon [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-05 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |