MS SC556 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Mississippi Songwriter-recording Artist Steve Azar, As Unofficial Music And Culture Ambassador For The State Of Mississippi And Welcoming Him On The Occasion Of The Mississippi Tourism Association Legislative Reception On January 25, 2017.
Title
Recognize Mississippi Songwriter and Recording Artist, Steve Azar, as Music and Culture Ambassador for 2017.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-03 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-03 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-03 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-19 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Rules |