MS SC553 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-24 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The "pride Of Desoto Central High School Marching Band" And Director Dennis Cox For Winning The 2021 Mhsaa Class 6a Marching Band Championship.
Title
Congratulate the "Pride of DeSoto Central High School Marching Band" for winning the 2021 Class 6A Marching Band Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael McLendon [R] | Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] |
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Rules |