MS SC549 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Life And Many Civic Contributions Of Dr. Kenneth Lyle Wooten, Former Registrar And Dean Of Admissions At The University Of Mississippi And First President Of The National Association Of Student Financial Aid Administrators, And Extend The Sympathy Of The Legislature To His Bereaved Family.
Title
Commend the life and civic contributions of Dr. Kenneth Wooten, former Registrar and Dean at University of Mississippi.
Sponsors
Sen. Gray Tollison [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-05 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |