MS SC548 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Passed on February 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Condolences Of The Mississippi Legislature To The Surviving Family Of Longtime State Representative Esther Harrison.
Title
Mourn the loss of longtime State Representative Esther Harrison.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-02 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-02-02 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-02-02 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |