MS SC548 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on February 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The French Camp Academy "panthers" Football Team And Coach Nathan Wright For Their First-ever Mhsaa Class 1a State Championship.
Title
Commend French Camp Academy "Panthers" Football Team for first-ever Class 1A State Championship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-02-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-02-05 | House | Adopted |
2014-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |