MS SC545 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Designate April 23-29, 2023, As "national Crime Victims' Week In Mississippi" And To Designate Friday, April 28, 2023, As A "day Of Prayer For Victims Of Crime In Mississippi".
Title
Designate April 23-29, 2023, as "National Crime Victims' Week in Mississippi" and April 28, 2023, as a "Day of Prayer".
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-02-14 | House | Immediate Release |
2023-02-14 | House | Adopted |
2023-02-09 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred To Rules |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred To Rules |