MS SC545 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Public Service Of Longtime Hinds County Circuit Court Judge And Former State Representative Tomie T. Green On The Occasion Of Her Retirement.
Title
Recognize public service of longtime Hinds County Circuit Court Judge and former State Representative Tomie T. Green.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-17 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-17 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-03-17 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-03-17 | House | Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-03-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Rules |