MS SC545 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Legendary Ole Miss Linebacker Patrick Willis Upon His Induction Into The College Football Hall Of Fame.
Title
Recognize Ole Miss Linebacker Patrick Willis upon his induction into the College Football Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Sen. Gray Tollison [D] | Sen. Walter Michel [R] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] | Sen. Kevin Blackwell [R] |
Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Briggs Hopson [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-12 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |