MS SC544 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 21 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Olympian Cory Mcgee From Pass Christian, Mississippi, For Her Outstanding Track And Field Accomplishment In The Women's 1500-meter Final At The 2020 Tokyo Olympics And Extending Best Wishes For Continued Success.
Title
Commend Olympian Cory McGee of Pass Christian for Track and Field accomplishments at 2020 Tokyo Olympics.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-16 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-04 | Senate | Referred To Rules |