MS SC544 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Outstanding Athletic Excellence Of Clinton High School Star Quarterback Cam Akers And Congratulating Him For His Record-setting 2016 Season And As "2016 Gatorade Mississippi Player Of The Year."
Title
Recognize outstanding athletic excellence of Clinton High School Quarterback Cam Akers "Mississippi Player of the Year."
Sponsors
Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Bob Dearing [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] | Sen. Tammy Witherspoon [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-19 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-02-23 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-02-23 | House | Immediate Release |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Referred To Rules |