MS SC544 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Lewisburg High School "marching Patriots" Band And Staff For Winning The 2014 Class 5a State Marching Band Championship.
Title
Commend the Lewisburg High School "Marching Patriots" Band and staff for winning the 2014 Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Massey [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-02-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-02-10 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-02-10 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |