MS SC543 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending The Members Of Phi Theta Kappa's All-mississippi Academic Team On The Occasion Of "mississippi Phi Theta Kappa Day."
Title
Commend Phi Theta Kappa's All-Mississippi Academic Team.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicole Boyd [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-29 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-28 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-26 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred To Rules |