MS SC543 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Participants In The Lawfit Challenge From The Mississippi Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks (team Wildlife) For Taking Top Honors And Setting New Records In The 17th Annual Lawfit Challenge Held In Southaven, Mississippi.
Title
Commend MDWFP Team Wildlife for top honors in the 2018 LawFit Challenge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-01 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-02-05 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-02-05 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |