MS SC543 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-14 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution To Commend And Congratulate The Picayune Junior High School "maroon Tide" Cheerleaders Squad And Coaches Heidi Arthur And Jessica Smith For Winning The Mhsaa Class 5a State Championship.
Title
Commend Picayune Junior High Cheerleaders for State 5A Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Perry Lee [R] |
Sen. Philip Moran [R] | Sen. Tony Smith [R] | Sen. Sean Tindell [R] | Sen. Michael Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-09 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-13 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-02-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-02-09 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-09 | Adopted | |
2012-02-08 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-02-08 | Referred To Rules | |
2012-02-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-02-08 | Immediate Release | |
2012-02-08 | Adopted | |
2012-02-07 | Title Suff Do Be Adopted | |
2012-01-30 | Referred To Rules |