MS SC541 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-01-31 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Paying Tribute To The Memory And Illustrious Career Of Mississippi Sports Legend Dave Meadow "boo" Ferriss.
Title
Pay tribute to the memory and illustrious career of Mississippi Sports Legend Dave Meadow "Boo" Ferriss.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2017-01-17 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Rules |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Adopted |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Referred To Rules |