MS SC541 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on February 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Renowned Comedian Tig Notaro Upon Her Receipt Of The 2016 Governor's Arts Award For Artist Achievement.
Title
Congratulate Tig Notaro for 2016 Governor's Arts Award for Artist Achievement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-02 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-02-02 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-02-02 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |