MS SC540 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 36-16)
Status: Passed on May 2 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing The Legacy Of Rosie S. Simmons As The First African American Since Reconstruction To Serve As Circuit Clerk Of Bolivar County, Mississippi.
Title
Recognize legacy of Rosie S. Simmons as the first African American since Reconstruction to serve as Bolivar County Circuit Clerk.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-01 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-29 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-04-04 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Referred To Rules |