MS SC540 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Recognition Of The Mississippi Legislature To Myrna Colley-lee As The Recipient Of The 2022 Governor's Arts Award For Excellence In Costume Design And Arts Patron.
Title
Recognize Myrna Colley-Lee as the recipient of the 2022 Governor's Arts Award for Costume Design and Arts Patron.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. David Jordan [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] |
Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Joseph Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-16 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |