MS SC540 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-06 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Loss And Commending The Service Of Major General Catherine Smith Lutz Of Flora, Mississippi's First Female Air National Guard Leader.
Title
Mourn the loss of Major General Catherine Smith Lutz, Mississippi's first female Air National Guard leader.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-31 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-01-31 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-01-31 | House | Immediate Release |
2014-01-31 | House | Adopted |
2014-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred To Rules |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Rules |