MS SC539 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on February 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Renowned Musician Tom "bones" Malone Upon His Receipt Of The 2016 Governor's Arts Award For Lifetime Achievement.
Title
Congratulate Tom "Bones" Malone for 2016 Governor's Arts Award for Lifetime Achievement.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Hillman Frazier [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] |
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Lydia Chassaniol [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-02 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-02-02 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-02-02 | House | Immediate Release |
2016-02-02 | House | Adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-28 | House | Referred To Rules |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Adopted |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |