MS SC538 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Title Suff Do Be Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Title Suff Do Be Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Requesting The Governor To Declare A State Of Emergency In Certain Counties In Mississippi Which Are Experiencing Major Expense And Severe Economic Impact Loss Due To Ongoing Drought Conditions Causing Pine Beetle Outbreak And Dead Tree Removal.
Title
Request the Governor to Declare a State of Emergency in areas impacted by the ongoing drought and pine beetle outbreak.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-26 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-03-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred To Rules |