MS SC538 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on February 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Billy J. "billy" Orr Upon The Occasion Of His Retirement As The Longtime Executive Director Of The Mississippi State Fair Commission And Thanking Him For His Leadership During A Period Of Unparalleled And Exciting Growth Of The Largest Fair In The Deep South.
Title
Recognize Billy Orr as longtime Executive Director of the Mississippi State Fairgrounds and thank him for his leadership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-02-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-02-10 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-02-10 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-09 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-30 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |