MS SC536 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Saluting And Extending The Congratulations Of The Mississippi Legislature To 90-year-old Blues Legend Bobby Rush For Winning A 2024 Grammy Award For "best Traditional Blues Album" At The 66th Grammy Awards For His Album Entitled All My Love For You.
Title
Extend congratulations of Legislature to Blues Legend Bobby Rush for winning 3rd Grammy Award for "Best Traditional Blues Album."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-19 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Referred To Rules |