MS SC536 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-18 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Recognition Of The Mississippi Legislature To Iconic Film Producer Lawrence "larry" Gordon As The Recipient Of The 2022 Governor's Arts Award For Lifetime Achievement In Motion Pictures And Television.
Title
Recognize Larry Gordon as the recipient of the 2022 Governor's Arts Award for Lifetime Achievement in Motion Pictures/Television.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] | Sen. Joseph Thomas [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] |
Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-16 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-16 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-16 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-16 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Referred To Rules |