MS SC536 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Failed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Died by Other Means
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

A Concurrent Resolution Establishing Of The State Taxation Study Committee To Examine And Develop Recommendations Regarding State Tax Policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Taxation Study Committee; establish.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01 Died by Other Means
2021-03-23SenateTransmitted To House
2021-03-22SenateAdopted
2021-03-18SenateTitle Suff Do Be Adopted
2021-03-17SenateReferred To Rules

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback