MS SC534 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-5)
Status: Passed on February 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The Jackson State University "tigers" Football Team And Award-winning Coach Deion "coach Prime" Sanders For A Remarkable Program Record 11-win Season And For Winning The Southwestern Athletic Conference (swac) Title For The First Time Since 2007.
Title
Congratulate Jackson State University "Tigers" Football Team and Coach Deion "Coach Prime" Sanders for remarkable season.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-02-08 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2022-02-08 | House | Immediate Release |
2022-02-08 | House | Adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred To Rules |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Referred To Rules |