MS SC534 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-01 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing Dr. Earlexia M. Norwood As Current Jackson State University National Alumni President And For Her Many Professional Honors As A Board-certified Family Medicine Physician.
Title
Recognize Dr. Earlexia M. Norwood as Jackson State University National Alumni President and for professional honors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-28 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Rules |