MS SC534 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Mourning The Passing Of Decorated World War Ii Veteran, Respected Civil Rights Activist And Prentiss, Mississippi, Civic Leader And Businessman Wardell Gray, And Extending The Condolences Of The Legislature To His Surviving Family.
Title
Mourn the death of first African-American to run for public office in Jefferson Davis County, Mr. Wardell Gray.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-18 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-18 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-18 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-18 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-16 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |