MS SC531 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Declaring That March 21, 2024, Is "world Down Syndrome Day In Mississippi" To Encourage Awareness And Opportunities For Individuals With Down Syndrome.
Title
Declare that March 21, 2024, is "World Down Syndrome in Mississippi."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred To Rules |