MS SC530 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 10 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Designating March 2024 As "american Red Cross Month In Mississippi" In Support Of Its Critical Humanitarian Mission.
Title
Designate March 2024 as "American Red Cross Month in Mississippi."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-08 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-05 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted |
2024-04-02 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred To Rules |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Adopted |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Rules |