MS SC530 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Passed on March 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating Ole Miss And Association Of Tennis Professionals Tour Tennis Standout Dave Randall Upon His Induction Into The Mississippi Sports Hall Of Fame And Museum.
Title
Commend Ole Miss and ATP tennis standout Dave Randall upon his induction into the Mississippi Sports Hall of Fame and Musuem.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-10 - House - House Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-10 | House | Immediate Release |
2021-03-10 | House | Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred To Rules |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Adopted |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Rules |