MS SC530 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Extending The Condolences Of The Mississippi Legislature To The Bereaved Family Of Longtime Deputy Attorney General Larry Edmond Clark Of Brandon, Mississippi, And Commending His Life Of Public Service To His State.
Title
Mourn the passing of longtime Mississippi Deputy Attorney General Larry Clark and commend his life of public service.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-26 - House - House Adopted (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-01-26 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2018-01-26 | House | Immediate Release |
2018-01-26 | House | Adopted |
2018-01-25 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-18 | House | Referred To Rules |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Rules |