MS SC529 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on February 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-04 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Commending And Congratulating The 2018 West Point High School "green Wave" Football Team And Head Coach Chris Chambless For Winning Their Third Consecutive Class 5a State Championship.
Title
Commend the 2018 West Point High School "Green Wave" Football Team for winning their three-peat Class 5A State Championship.
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Turner-Ford [D] | Sen. Juan Barnett [D] | Sen. Nickey Browning [R] | Sen. Eugene Clarke [R] |
Sen. Sampson Jackson [D] | Sen. Sollie Norwood [D] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-28 - House - House Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-01-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-01-28 | House | Immediate Release |
2019-01-28 | House | Adopted |
2019-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-22 | House | Referred To Rules |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Rules |