MS SC529 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on January 26 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-26 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Recognizing And Congratulating Reverend Jerry Young As The First Mississippi Pastor Chosen As President Of The National Baptist Convention, Usa.
Title
Recognize Reverend Jerry Young as the first Mississippi Pastor chosen as President of the National Baptist Convention.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-19 - House - House Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-01-19 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2015-01-19 | House | Immediate Release |
2015-01-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-01-15 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-14 | House | Referred To Rules |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Adopted |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred To Rules |