MS SC528 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - Enrolled Bill Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A Concurrent Resolution Congratulating Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority, Inc., On The Occasion Of Its Policy Impact "2020 Aka Day At The Mississippi State Capitol" To Promote Advocacy And Take Action For Human Rights And Social Justice.
Title
"Alpha Kappa Alpha Sorority Day at the Capitol"; observe on March 17, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-02-12 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-02-12 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-02-12 | House | Adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-02-05 | House | Referred To Rules |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Immediate Release |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Adopted |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Be Adopted |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred To Rules |